WIRRAL HOSPICE ST JOHN'S

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Specialist Palliative Care in Wirral comprising Inpatient, Outpatient , Wellbeing Services, Hospice at Home and advice line.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£8,021,476
Donations and legacies | £2.09m | |
Charitable activities | £3.09m | |
Other trading activities | £2.59m | |
Investments | £249.02k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£7,520,558
Raising funds | £1.79m | |
Charitable activities | £5.73m | |
Other | £0 |
£622,556 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £2,758,967 from 2 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.79m | |
Charitable expenditure | £5.73m | |
Retained for future use | £500.92k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.79m | |
Charitable expenditure | £5.73m | |
Retained for future use | £1.12m |
People

172 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
404 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Wirral
Governance
- ST JOHN'S HOSPICE (Previous name)
- WIRRAL HOSPICE ST JOHN'S LTD (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Andrew Bailey | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Porter | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nichola Sandman | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tim McDonnell | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Wynne | Trustee | 11 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Roger Hooton Platt | Trustee | 05 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Meadows | Trustee | 05 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jean Quinn | Trustee | 26 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hilary Leggat | Trustee | 26 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Steve Schroeder | Trustee | 09 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.24m | £6.55m | £6.73m | £7.97m | £8.02m | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.48m | £5.08m | £5.69m | £6.75m | £7.52m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £2.13m | £2.20m | £2.76m | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.77m | £388.07k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £774.27k | £1.43m | £1.98m | £3.02m | £2.09m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.90m | £1.66m | £1.93m | £2.25m | £2.59m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.40m | £3.33m | £2.68m | £2.51m | £3.09m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £160.39k | £127.08k | £145.08k | £185.11k | £249.02k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £467.52k | £1.03m | £1.66m | £2.56m | £1.66m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £4.22m | £3.95m | £4.27m | £5.13m | £5.73m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.25m | £1.14m | £1.42m | £1.62m | £1.79m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £31.47k | £24.90k | £40.35k | £47.48k | £49.09k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £29.56k | £26.95k | £45.71k | £22.16k | £21.56k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £5.13m | £5.01m | £4.97m | £5.05m | £12.10m | |
|
Long-term investments | £4.39m | £6.27m | £6.90m | £6.52m | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £2.80m | £3.28m | £3.01m | £5.67m | £6.17m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.58m | £1.42m | £541.53k | £2.04m | £1.95m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/09/1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/03/1981 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/09/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/02/2002 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 05/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13/04/2011 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24/11/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12/01/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 MAY 2023
Charitable objects
1.1 TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ILLNESS AND SUFFERING IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE METROPOLITAN COUNTY OF MERSEYSIDE AND COUNTY OF CHESHIRE AND ADJACENT AREAS AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY WHETHER GEOGRAPHICAL OR OTHERWISE OF SUCH OBJECT): 1.1.1 BY ESTABLISHING, MAINTAINING AND CONDUCTING RESIDENTIAL NURSING AND CONVALESCENT HOMES AND HOSPICES FOR THE RECEPTION AND CARE OF PERSONS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM ANY CHRONIC OR TERMINAL ILLNESS OR FROM ANY DISABILITY OR DISEASE AND BY PROVIDING MEDICAL OR OTHER TREATMENT OR ATTENTION FOR ANY SUCH PERSONS AS AFORESAID WHEREVER IT IS APPROPRIATE TO DO SO; 1.1.2 BY CONDUCTING OR PROMOTING OR ENCOURAGING RESEARCH INTO THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ANY SUCH ILLNESS, DISABILITY, DISEASE OR INFIRMITY AS AFORESAID AND, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FORGOING, PARTICULARLY INTO THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM CANCER OR TERMINAL ILLNESSES AND BY PROVIDING FOR THE DISSEMINATION OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; 1.1.3 BY PROMOTING OR ENCOURAGING OR ASSISTING IN THE TEACHING OR TRAINING OF DOCTORS, NURSES, ALLIED HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS AND OTHER PERSONS ENGAGED IN ANY BRANCH OF MEDICINE, SURGERY, NURSING OR ALLIED SERVICES AND IN THE TEACHING OR TRAINING OF STUDENTS IN ANY BRANCH OF MEDICINE, SURGERY, NURSING OR ALLIED SERVICES; 1.1.4 BY PROVIDING HOLISTIC CARE BOTH FOR THE PATIENT AND THE FAMILY OF THE PATIENT AND TO PROVIDE AN ENVIRONMENT IN WHICH THE PATIENT CAN LIVE EACH DAY TO THE FULLEST AND DIE IN DIGNITY WITHOUT PHYSICAL OR EMOTIONAL SUFFERING. THIS PROVISION MAY BE AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION BUT ONLY WITH THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE COMMISSION.
Area of benefit
MERSEYSIDE AND CHESHIRE AND ADJACENT AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
WIRRAL HOSPICE
ST JOHN'S
MOUNT ROAD
HIGHER BEBINGTON
WIRRAL
- Phone:
- 01513342778
- Email:
- info@wirralhospice.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window