APOSTOLIC PREFECTURE OF THE FALKLANDS AND MISSION TO ST HELENA, TRISTAN DA CUNHA AND ASCENSION ISLAND CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the CIO is the advancement of the Roman Catholic religion through the religious and other charitable work of the Apostolic Prefecture of the Falkland Islands and the Mission sui juris of St Helena, Ascension Island and Tristan da Cunha as the Trustees with the approval of the Ordinary shall from time to time think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Falkland Islands
- Saint Helena
- South Georgia And South Sandwich Islands
Governance
- 21 September 2017: CIO registration
- PREFECTURE OF THE FALKLANDS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fr Tom Thomas | Chair | 31 July 2024 |
|
|||||||||
BENJAMIN JAMES FLEETWOOD-SMYTH M.A. | Trustee | 21 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
EUGENE CHRISTOPHER AHERN LLB | Trustee | 21 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
LINDA MARY RANSOM | Trustee | 21 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £998 | £1.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.43k | £28.01k | £8.87k | £12.25k | £253.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 21 Sep 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION THROUGH THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE APOSTOLIC PREFECTURE AS THE TRUSTEES WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE ORDINARY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Etheldredas Catholic Church
14 Ely Place
London
EC1N 6RY
- Phone:
- 020 7405 1061
- Email:
- tompattasseril@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window