Trustees ENFIELD TOWN COMMUNITY CHURCH
Charity Number: 1175011

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NATHAN HOWARD | Chair | 06 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Matt Maher | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dougal Burrowes | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WISBEY | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Gregory | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sam Sinyinza | Trustee | 08 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID PARKER | Trustee | 06 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW WRIGHT | Trustee | 06 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
COLIN CLARK | Trustee | 06 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT CAWLEY | Trustee | 06 October 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.