Financial history KENT FA CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1174782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £15.95k £68 £44.43k £33.32k £19.15k
Total expenditure £9.96k £41.39k £11.29k £35.33k £36.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A