Trustees RYTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 1175175

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Wright | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Veronica Solomon | Trustee | 11 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wayne Hinds | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Guinevere May | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Huw Powell Roberts | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE ANNE COLLARD | Trustee | 16 October 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.