Financial history BIRDLIP SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1173968
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £9.81k £7.88k £11.47k £8.82k £13.11k
Total expenditure £3.36k £5.51k £9.13k £11.60k £13.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A