THE FRIENDS OF YORK ART GALLERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds from members' subscriptions, from organising educational visits, functions and parties, in order to aid the development of the York Art Gallery Collection and to sponsor activities to further the appreciation of fine arts in York and its immediate surrounds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of York
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 22 October 1980: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF YORK GALLERY (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF YORK ART GALLERY (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Charles Anthony Martindale | Chair | 14 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Cynthia Barbor | Trustee | 22 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jessica Noel Richardson | Trustee | 22 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amanda Hilliam | Trustee | 22 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Henry Dunn-McAfee | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Lamb | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Helena Cox | Trustee | 26 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul McLean | Trustee | 03 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Moira Fulton | Trustee | 20 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Benjamin Hilliam | Trustee | 20 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne McLean | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ronald Wallace Clayton | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Verena Smallpage | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Azizah Saidah Clayton | Trustee | 29 March 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.82k | £43.59k | £45.64k | £41.63k | £45.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £169.79k | £22.76k | £37.88k | £21.59k | £60.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23/3/1979 AS AMENDED 28/2/1992, 24/3/1995, MAY 1998, 29/3/2008 AND 15/3/2012 23/03/1979 AS AMENDED ON 29 MAR 2017 as amended on 27 Mar 2021 as amended on 14 Apr 2025
Charitable objects
TO LINK TOGETHER ALL FRIENDS OF THE YORK ART GALLERY AND ESTABLISH A CIRCLE OF SUPPORTERS WHO WILL AID IN THE FURTHER DEVELOPMENT OF THE COLLECTION OF THE YORK ART GALLERY BY SUBSCRIPTION, GIFTS, BEQUESTS OR DONATIONS, AND TO SPONSOR ACTIVITIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE APPRECIATION OF THE FINE ARTS IN YORK AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Area of benefit
YORK ART GALLERY
Contact information
- Address:
-
York Art Gallery
Exhibition Square
YORK
YO1 7EW
- Phone:
- 01904761211
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window