Financial history SNOWDONIA DONKEYS

Charity number: 1176577
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £35.37k £57.51k £148.02k £145.41k £133.28k
Total expenditure £21.88k £45.27k £96.06k £160.72k £95.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £33.59k £32.60k £1.50k