THE NATIONAL SIKH WAR MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public through the creation and erection in central London of a permanent memorial commemorating the role of Sikhs in the military service of Great Britain; fund raising activities in connection with the erection of this memorial
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 December 2017: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW WILLIAM MILDMAY FANE OBE MA FCA | Chair | 21 December 2017 |
|
|||||
Joga Singh | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jaspal Singh Bhambra | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
KULTAR SINGH KHANGURA | Trustee | 21 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
IAN JAMES HENDERSON CBE BSC | Trustee | 21 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
CLARE GORST | Trustee | 21 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
SATINDER PAL SINGH CHADHA | Trustee | 21 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £7.23k | £3.00k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 September 2024 | 309 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 February 2022 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 February 2022 | 106 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 April 2021 | 157 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 April 2021 | 157 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
THE CREATION AND MAINTENANCE OF A PUBLIC WAR MEMORIAL HONOURING SIKHS IN MILITARY SERVICE OF GREAT BRITAIN AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS RELATING TO THEIR ROLE, SERVICE AND SACRIFICE
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/o Joga Singh
PwC
1 Embankment Place
LONDON
WC2N 6RH
- Phone:
- 07850636057
- Email:
- enquiries@nswmt.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window