Financial history FARNCOMBE DAY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1175294
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £184.36k £178.83k £188.08k £194.46k £210.32k
Total expenditure £157.12k £157.74k £179.36k £187.73k £217.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £79.05k £92.50k £71.00k £65.00k £65.00k