THE FOUNDRY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of the Foundry Church is the advancement of the Christian faith in the borough of Halton and beyond. The church looks to meet the needs of the local community and congregation both practically and spiritually. There are high quality youth and children's programmes on a weekly basis and a variety of events and meetings available for the over 60's.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £3,722 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Halton
Governance
- 10 August 2017: Standard registration
- 14 April 2022: Funds received from 1002395 HALTON PENTECOSTAL CHURCH CHARITY
- Foundry Community Church Ltd (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steven Allen Greenow | Chair | 05 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Howard John Carruthers Kelly | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Lois Martha Taviner | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Andrew John Holland | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Agnes Toluwalope Majaro | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kwesi Ackah | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Diane Daniels | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP MARK HOLLAND | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|||||
SEAN JOHN SMITH | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £268.61k | £217.41k | £196.36k | £250.66k | £194.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £309.53k | £198.32k | £196.99k | £217.10k | £156.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £9.73k | £26.57k | £3.72k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 June 2024 | 217 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 June 2024 | 217 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
2.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: (A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; (B) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND (C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Foundry
65 Lugsdale Road
Widnes
WA8 6DA
- Phone:
- 01514208837
- Email:
- office@thefoundry.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window