ORLETON RECREATION ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing recreational open space on Orleton Recreation Ground for a number of sporting and other outdoor activities, including a child friendly playground, to benefit the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 04 October 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM SHAW | Chair | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Catherine Clayton | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian Leslie Powell | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Annabel L Beaumont | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marjorie Jean Pritchard | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Morgan | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Haydn Morgan | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABTH EMMA MACKAY | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW CADWALLADER | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM JENKINS | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/07/2020 | 15/07/2021 | 15/07/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.26k | £18.84k | £8.11k | £2.65k | £8.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.82k | £4.40k | £10.74k | £3.51k | £4.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £25.33k | £18.23k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 22 May 2024 | 146 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 July 2022 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 July 2021 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 July 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 July 2020 | 23 October 2021 | 161 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09 SEP 1988 AS AMENDED ON 16 JUN 2002
Charitable objects
THE PROPERTY HEREBY CONVEYED (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE TRUST PROPERTY") SHALL BE HELD ON TRUST FOR A RECREATION GROUND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF ORLETON IN THE COUNTY OF HEREFORDSHIRE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Peppermint House
Green Lane
Orleton
LUDLOW
Shropshire
SY8 4JE
- Phone:
- 01584 831 904
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window