Trustees ORLETON RECREATION ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 1174973

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM SHAW | Chair | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Catherine Clayton | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian Leslie Powell | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Annabel L Beaumont | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marjorie Jean Pritchard | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Morgan | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Haydn Morgan | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABTH EMMA MACKAY | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW CADWALLADER | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM JENKINS | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.