THE JEWEL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of unemployment or financial hardship through the facilitation and provision of services to deliver economic and employment opportunities and to provide support for individuals to be self-sufficient and able to generate a sustainable income.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Trafford
Governance
- 14 February 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID ZUCKER | Chair | 17 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH MYERS | Trustee | 17 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP CORN | Trustee | 17 March 2017 |
|
|||||
CRAIG LEWIS | Trustee | 17 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.00k | £124.16k | £195.17k | £142.96k | £102.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £96.65k | £81.10k | £115.05k | £116.42k | £107.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.25k | £76.52k | £54.60k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT INCLUDING; (A) THE FACILITATION AND PROVISION OF SERVICES TO DELIVER ECONOMIC AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES. (B) TO PROVIDE THE NECESSARY SUPPORT FOR INDIVIDUALS TO BE SELF SUFFICIENT AND ABLE TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME, EITHER THROUGH ASSISTING THEM TO FIND EMPLOYMENT OR SUPPORTING THEM IN SELF EMPLOYMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Jewel Foundation
Sedgley Community Hub
Bishops Road
Prestwich
MANCHESTER
M25 0HT
- Phone:
- 01617982123
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window