INTERNATIONAL WELFARE ALLIANCE (IWARELIEF))

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote and protect human rights through research, legal actions and advocacy and capacity building. Health promotion, medicine, Food, clothing, shelter provision and empowerment projects Supporting individuals and communities affected by security issues, promoting safety and well -beings, providing resources and advocacy for those in need,also focusing on safeguarding vulnerable populations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Algeria
- Angola
- Benin
- Burkina Faso
- Burundi
- Cameroon
- Central African Republic
- Chad
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Djibouti
- Egypt
- Eritrea
- Ethiopia
- Gabon
- Ghana
- Guinea
- Guinea-bissau
- Ivory Coast
- Kenya
- Liberia
- Libya
- Malawi
- Mali
- Mauritania
- Morocco
- Namibia
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Rwanda
- Senegal
- Sierra Leone
- Somalia
- South Africa
- South Sudan
- Sudan
- The Gambia
- Togo
- Uganda
- United States
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 01 February 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BERNICE MUFOR NKEKEH | Chair | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Terfot Augustine Ngwana | Trustee | 04 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
TEKU MUTAH | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/07/2019 | 30/07/2020 | 30/07/2021 | 30/07/2022 | 30/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £4.32k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £360 | £4.32k | £150 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 July 2023 | 20 June 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2023 | 20 June 2024 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 July 2022 | 15 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2022 | 15 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 July 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 July 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 July 2019 | 04 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2019 | 18 March 2021 | 292 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 01 Feb 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEEDS BY REASONS OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN THE UK AND AFRICAN COUNTRIES WHERE HEALTH STANDARDS ARE LOW BY: - PROVIDING INFORMATION AND ADVICE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC ABOUT LOCAL HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE SERVICE - MAKING THE VIEWS AND EXPERIENCE OF MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC KNOWN TO HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE PROVIDERS. - ENABLING LOCAL PEOPLE TO HAVE A VOICE IN THE DEVELOPMENT, DELIVERY AND QUALITY OF ACCESS TO LOCAL HEALTH AND CARE SERVICES AND FACILITIES BY INVOLVING THE LOCAL COMMUNITIES IN COLLECTIVE EFFORTS SO THEY GAIN THE CONFIDENCE IN THEIR OWN ABILITIES TO INFLUENCE DECISIONS IN RELATION TO HEALTH - PROVIDING NETWORK OPPORTUNITIES WITH AND BETWEEN, MEMBERS OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITIES; COMMUNITY GROUPS; AND ORGANISATIONS WITH THE COMMUNITY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY ON ISSUES SUCH AS HEALTH; HOUSING; EMPLOYMEN; EMERGENCY RELIEFS, EDUCATION, SPORTS; ARTS AND CULTURE; SUBSTANCE MISUSE; POVERTY;SOCIAL BENEFITS AND POLICIES; ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION; FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT PARTICULARLY RELATING TO PEOPLES OWN HEALTH.
Area of benefit
IN THE UK AND AFRICAN COUNTRIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Leicester Road
MELTON MOWBRAY
Leicestershire
LE13 0DB
- Phone:
- 07786682926
- Email:
- info@iwarelief.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window