RICHARD TAYLOR'S EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RTET merged with existing charities RTEF and BYC owning Richard Taylor CofE School and Bilton Youth Centre to support RTS and young people in Harrogate with educational grants and to provide young people, the elderly and the disadvantaged in Harrogate and beyond with recreational services for their health wellbeing intellectual and social benefit and grants to improve their spiritual health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Councillor Steven Paul Haslam | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
FELICITY JANET HILDRED | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Sheena Mary Hodgeon | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alene Elizabeth Bloomfield | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Robert Scott | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clive Hodgeon | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
KRISTIAN JAY RANDALL | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Wilson Helm | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.36k | £18.96k | £24.37k | £45.48k | £69.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.79k | £35.35k | £14.33k | £28.65k | £117.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Nov 2017 as amended on 13 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
3. The objects of the CIO are specifically restricted to the following wholly charitable purposes only: 3.1 To advance education by applying such yearly income as the charity trustees see fit, being not more than one-quarter of the said net income, in providing such special benefits, of any kind not normally provided from central or local government funds for the school known as Richard Taylor Church of England Primary School (or its successor) (the “School”) as may from time to time be agreed upon by trustees and the governors of the School, provided that the Charity Commission may, on the application of the charity trustees, approve in any year a sum in excess of the said one-quarter. 3.2 To advance education by applying the net yearly income of the CIO in one or more of the following ways for the benefit of boys and girls resident in the Borough of Harrogate who, in the opinion of the charity trustees, are in need of financial assistance: – 3.2.1 Exhibitions or Grants tenable at any secondary school, training college for teachers, university, or other institution of further (including professional and technical) education, approved by the charity trustees, to be awarded under rules to be made by the charity trustees, including rules as to the value and period of tenure of the exhibitions, and the qualifications, and method of ascertainment and selection, of candidates; 3.2.2 Financial assistance, outfits, clothing, tools, instruments or books to help beneficiaries on leaving school, university or any other educational establishment, to prepare for, or to enter a profession, trade or calling; or 3.2.3 Otherwise promoting the education (including social and physical training) of beneficiaries; provided that in the allocation of such benefits, the charity trustees shall have regard to the promotion of education in the principles of the Church of England 3.3 For the for the public benefit, including for the benefit of the inhabitants of the borough of Harrogate:- 3.3.1 to promote the development of children and young people aged under 25 years in achieving their full physical, mental, social and spiritual capacities so that they may grow to full maturity as individuals and members of society and that their conditions of life may be improved; and 3.3.2 provide, or assist in the provision of, facilities for recreation or other leisure time occupation to such persons who have need of such facilities by reason of their youth, age, infirmity, disability, poverty or social and economic circumstances or for the public at large in the interests of social welfare and with the object of improving their conditions of life.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Richard Taylor Primary School
Bilton Lane
HARROGATE
North Yorkshire
HG1 3DT
- Phone:
- 01423 565129
- Email:
- clerk.rtef@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window