Financial history THE MARMALADE TRUST

Charity Number: 1174217
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £129.40k £156.37k £144.71k £153.71k £317.04k
Total expenditure £103.46k £88.44k £136.60k £174.93k £227.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £30.53k £20.00k N/A £9.97k N/A