THE FRIENDS OF THE STOCKTON & DARLINGTON RAILWAY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work to preserve the 1825 Stockton and Darlington Railway a site of international importance and start of the modern railway. Working with partners on promotion, access, interpretation, research and conservation of our heritage, we aim to raise profile and awareness locally, nationally and internationally and apply how this can be used for education, community and economic regeneration.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 26 September 2023
Total income includes £18,574 from 4 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Darlington
- Durham
- Middlesbrough
- Redcar And Cleveland
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 20 February 2018: CIO registration
- THE FRIENDS OF THE S&DR (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil HARDIE-HAMMOND | Chair | 07 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Derek Raw | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
John George Alderslade | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Norman Jeffrey Hugill | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Barry Thompson | Trustee | 16 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALAN ROBSON TOWNSEND | Trustee | 07 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
PETER BAINBRIDGE | Trustee | 07 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR ROSS CHISHOLM | Trustee | 07 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE HARDIE | Trustee | 07 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 27/09/2019 | 26/09/2020 | 26/09/2021 | 26/09/2022 | 26/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.87k | £8.82k | £43.20k | £20.22k | £41.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.88k | £5.37k | £22.92k | £20.65k | £35.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.50k | £36.13k | £10.28k | £18.57k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 26 September 2023 | 21 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 September 2023 | 21 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 September 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 September 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 September 2021 | 06 December 2022 | 133 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 September 2021 | 06 December 2022 | 133 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 September 2020 | 27 July 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 September 2020 | 27 July 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 27 September 2019 | 07 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 September 2019 | 07 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 20 Feb 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE STOCKTON AND DARLINGTON RAILWAY (S&DR) AND ITS SEMINAL ROLE IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE MODERN RAILWAY THROUGH ITS NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL INFLUENCE AND THE CONSERVATION OF THE STRUCTURES, ARCHIVES AND ARTEFACTS OF THE S&DR.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Marian Cottage
Lartington
BARNARD CASTLE
County Durham
DL12 9BP
- Phone:
- 01833650233
- Email:
- info@sdr1825.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window