Accounts and annual returns HAPPY FACES PRUDHOE

Charity Number: 1176920
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 05 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 05 September 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 January 2023 13 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 13 October 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 January 2022 26 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 26 June 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 January 2021 29 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 29 September 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 January 2020 15 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 15 July 2020 On Time