TALAN'S TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Talan's Trust fund raise to help fund a full time researcher into Rhabdomyosarcoma, a childhood cancer. The researcher is based at the ICR, Royal Marsden Hospital, Surrey. Talan's trust also raise awareness of childhood cancer at their events run throughout the year. These include an annual run, the Bath half marathon, the London marathon and varying events in Cornwall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 04 December 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH PENNY | Chair | 04 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
EMMA BARTROP | Trustee | 04 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA HAMMOND | Trustee | 04 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
SIMON HAMMOND | Trustee | 04 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Denise Wellington | Trustee | 04 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
DARYL WELLINGTON | Trustee | 04 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.54k | £13.50k | £38.14k | £31.05k | £26.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.20k | £51.64k | £51.64k | £1.26k | £25.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 November 2021 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO IS: THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH OF CHILDREN WITH RHABDOMYOSARCOMA (RMS), IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH: (1) THE PROMOTION OF EARLY DIAGNOSIS OF RMS; (2) RAISING MONIES TO FACILITATE RESEARCH INTO RMS TO AID DIAGNOSIS, TREATMENT OPTIONS AND CURE; AND (3) RAISING AWARENESS OF RMS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Binhamy
Stratton
BUDE
Cornwall
EX23 9TG
- Phone:
- 07814808821
- Email:
- TALANSTRUST@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
TALANSTRUST.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window