Accounts and annual returns LEEDS VOCAL MOVEMENT

Charity number: 1177305
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 July 2024 03 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2024 Accounts not yet received
Annual return 30 July 2023 25 June 2024 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2023 25 June 2024 26 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 July 2022 17 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2022 17 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 July 2021 05 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2021 05 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 July 2020 09 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2020 09 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window