LEEDS VOCAL MOVEMENT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Leeds Vocal Movement is an un-auditioned choir for 18-35 year olds in Leeds City Centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 July 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leeds City
Governance
- 26 February 2018: CIO registration
- LVM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas David Lyall George | Chair | 22 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tarot Swift | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Scott Wiseman | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Blair Gordon | Trustee | 02 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Paixao Costa | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oscar Webber | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aidan Stirk | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Francesca Louise Russo | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/07/2020 | 30/07/2021 | 30/07/2022 | 30/07/2023 | 30/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.92k | £2.33k | £4.13k | £9.63k | £9.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.70k | £3.01k | £5.85k | £9.33k | £9.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 July 2024 | 03 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2024 | Accounts not yet received | ||
Annual return | 30 July 2023 | 25 June 2024 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2023 | 25 June 2024 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 July 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 July 2021 | 05 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2021 | 05 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 July 2020 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2020 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 26 FEB 2018 AMENDED TO CIO FOUNDATION 09 SEP 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (A) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING PRACTICAL AND THEORETICAL MUSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE AGED BETWEEN 18 AND 35 YEARS IN AND AROUND LEEDS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: I) PROVIDING MUSICAL TUITION, GUIDANCE AND PRACTISE AT REHEARSALS LED BY AN EXPERIENCED MUSICAL PROFESSIONAL, ALLOWING EACH INDIVIDUAL TO ADVANCE IN THEIR KNOWLEDGE AND SKILL. II) ORGANISING PERFORMANCE OPPORTUNITIES, ALLOWING INDIVIDUALS TO ENHANCE THEIR EXPERIENCE OF PERFORMING MUSIC. III) REMOVING BARRIERS TO MUSICAL EDUCATION, BY OFFERING SUBSIDISED MEMBERSHIP FEES FOR THOSE ON A LOW INCOME, AND ACCEPTING MEMBERS WITHOUT AUDITION OR PRIOR EXPERIENCE. (B) TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Petrie Street
LEEDS
LS13 1NA
- Phone:
- 07503155048
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window