Accounts and annual returns LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND BEEKEEPERS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 510687
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2015 06 April 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 06 April 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2014 27 April 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 27 April 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2013 01 March 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required