Governing document LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND BEEKEEPERS ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 510687
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED MARCH 1962 AS AMENDED 29 MAR 1980, 25 MAR 1995, 8 APR 2002, 1 MAY 2004, 1 NOV 2004 AND 13 APR 2010.
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE THE HONEYBEE, BY PROMOTING THE CRAFT OF BEEKEEPING AND EDUCATING THE PUBLIC OF THE BENEFIT OF BEES TO THE ENVIRONMENT.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.