PRESTON AFGHAN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Centre to help local Afghan community of Preston
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
Governance
- 05 January 2018: CIO registration
- PRESTON AFGHAN COMMUNITY ASSOSIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Talib Husseini | Chair | 03 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Farhad Hidari | Trustee | 03 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
mohamed akbari | Trustee | 03 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
jumal jaffari | Trustee | 03 December 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/01/2020 | 04/01/2021 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.46k | £3.55k | £8.62k | £22.42k | £11.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.85k | £5.60k | £6.79k | £18.78k | £9.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 January 2021 | 16 February 2022 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 January 2021 | 16 February 2022 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 January 2020 | 26 January 2022 | 448 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 January 2020 | 26 January 2022 | 448 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE MUSLIM RELIGION IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROMOTING AND ORGANISING ISLAMIC RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES INCLUDING FESTIVALS AND WORSHIP TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF PRESTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
179 Eldon Street
Ashton-On-Ribble
PRESTON
PR2 2BA
- Phone:
- 07731788979
- Email:
- NOOR.ZEERAK@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window