CAMDEN GIVING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Camden Giving connects Camden to end local inequality. Provide Grants Instigate collaboration between sectors Raise awareness of inequality in London.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,486,195
Donations and legacies | £1.40m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £55.96k | |
Investments | £29.73k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,463,516
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.46m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £270,300 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.46m | |
Retained for future use | £22.68k |
People

10 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Camden
Governance
- 31 August 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robin Chu | Chair | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Ruth Wilson | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marco Greco | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Franci Viviana | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mariam Hassan | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Corrinne Browne | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Dyke | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rose Alexander | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Graham Dyer | Trustee | 04 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tom Holliss | Trustee | 27 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Allan Sutherland | Trustee | 26 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.98m | £2.34m | £1.01m | £1.28m | £1.49m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.62m | £1.67m | £1.10m | £1.45m | £1.46m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.61m | £1.57m | £327.78k | £328.27k | £270.30k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.97m | £3.16m | £1.00m | £1.26m | £1.40m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £55.96k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £9.86k | £9.86k | £10.14k | £19.46k | £29.73k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.62m | £1.67m | £1.10m | £1.45m | £1.46m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.50k | £82.27k | £72.08k | £87.74k | £33.61k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £1.32m | £736.66k | £859.65k | £814.69k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.71k | £3.46k | £2.82k | £2.85k | £2.60k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.86m | £2.41m | £1.78m | £1.20m | £1.15m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.19m | £1.47m | £925.68k | £515.55k | £449.82k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Aug 2017 as amended on 14 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE PEOPLE WHO LIVE AND WORK IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF CAMDEN AND SURROUNDING LONDON BOROUGHS, INCLUDING: A) THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF MEMBERS OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; B) THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY; C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; D) THE RELIEVE OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER; E) THE PROMOTION OF THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; F) THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY AND THE FOSTERING OF GREATER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; AND G) THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY (AND FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PART OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF BEING A MEMBER OF A SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED COMMUNITY).
Contact information
- Address:
-
5-7 Buck Street
LONDON
NW1 8NJ
- Phone:
- 07872534079
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window