Financial history SMILE AID

Charity number: 1178216
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £316.64k £489.27k £369.51k £282.15k £553.19k
Total expenditure £256.64k £322.02k £396.53k £212.77k £403.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £18.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £553.19k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £394.40k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £9.19k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0