WE REMEMBER SUBMARINERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We operate in England and Wales, raising funds to support submariners, their families and groups and organisations affiliated to the Royal Navy Submarine Service. We provide support and acts of remembrance for submariners that have passed away through the provision of a wreath, Moly Pins and condolence card to immediate family. We also sign post support and services where needed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 June 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 December 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael dewhirst | Chair | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Commodore Andrew George James RN | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cdre Robert J Anstey OBE | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marc Simon | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Michael James Cushen | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel John Grenfell Bryant | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Anderson | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Molyneux | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nick MIller | Trustee | 06 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Richards | Trustee | 06 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Fisher | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Graham Bishop | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/06/2020 | 01/06/2021 | 01/06/2022 | 01/06/2023 | 01/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.52k | £108.70k | £95.00k | £96.67k | £92.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £97.07k | £61.17k | £95.00k | £95.03k | £76.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 June 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 June 2023 | 03 April 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2023 | 03 April 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 June 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 June 2021 | 22 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2021 | 22 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 June 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 June 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 22 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
AIMS AND OBJECTIVES OF THE CHARITY WE REMEMBER SUBMARINERS. THE PROMOTION OF EFFICIENCY IN THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN BY THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF FACILITIES AND ACTIVITIES FOR THE EFFICIENCY AND WELL-BEING OF SERVICE PERSONNEL. IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1. TO FUND AND DISTRIBUTE A MEMORIAL LAPEL PIN KNOWN AS MOLLY PINS, IN MEMORY OF LT-CMDR. IAN MOLYNEUX GM RN. THESE WILL BE GIFTED TO CLOSE RELATIVES OF THE DEPARTED SUBMARINER. THIS PIN FEATURING A GOLD POPPY IN A WREATH OF RED POPPIES, REPRESENTS THE FAMILIES DECEASED SUBMARINER. THIS PIN IS NOT AVAILABLE TO PURCHASE, CERTAIN CRITERIA MUST BE MET BEFORE THESE PINS ARE AWARDED. 2. TO FUND WREATHS TO BE LAID AT VARIOUS SUBMARINER RELATED MEMORIALS, SUCH AS THE SUBMARINE MEMORIAL SERVICE AT THE EMBANKMENT, LONDON. THE WREATH-LAYING AT THE MEMORIAL OF SUBMARINERS IN WESTMINSTER ABBEY CLOISTERS, THE NATIONAL CENOTAPH IN LONDON, TOGETHER WITH OTHER SITES ACROSS THE WORLD. 3. TO FUND A WREATH FOR ANY SERVING OR RETIRED SUBMARINER WHO CROSSES THE BAR. OR TO DONATE IN LIEU OF THE WREATH AS SPECIFIED BY THE NEXT OF KIN. 4. TO PRODUCE A YEARLY LAPEL PIN, WHICH HONOURS THE SUBMARINES LOST IN THAT YEAR, WITH RED POPPIES AND SUBMARINERS WHO SADLY PASS AWAY THAT YEAR IN GOLD POPPIES. THESE PINS WILL BE AVAILABLE TO BE SOLD FROM AUGUST 1ST EACH YEAR. THE FUNDS RAISED FROM THE PIN SALES EACH YEAR WILL ASSIST IN THE PURCHASE OF THE NEXT YEAR’S PIN. 5. IDENTIFYING SERVING SUBMARINERS, SUBMARINE SERVICE VETERANS OR DEPENDENTS WHO NEED SUPPORT AND EITHER PROVIDE DIRECT HELP OR SIGNPOST TO AN APPROPRIATE ORGANIZATION. 6. PROVIDING FUNDS TO RELIEVE STRESS OR NEED AMONGST PAST AND PRESENT MEMBERS OF ALL RANKS OF THE SUBMARINE SERVICE AND THEIR DEPENDENTS IF REQUESTED BY A RELEVANT SERVICE CHARITY. 7. TO PROVIDE FUNDING IN ORDER TO SUPPORT THE CONTINUED EXISTENCE OF SUCH CHARITABLE CAUSES AND ORGANIZATIONS PERCEIVED TO BE IN THE INTERESTS OF FUTURE, SERVING AND RETIRED SUBMARINERS AND THEIR FAMILIES BY THE CHARITY. 8. A PERCENTAGE OF THE FUNDS RAISED WILL BE DONATED TO GROUPS WHO SEEK THE GROUPS HELP IN ASSISTING THEM, EACH CASE WILL BE JUDGED ON ITS MERITS AND ARE AGREED BY THE TRUSTEES. 9. TO PRODUCE FOR SALE ITEMS OF MEMORABILIA SUCH AS POLO SHIRTS, MUGS ETC. TO ASSIST IN RAISING FUNDS FOR THE GROUP, ALLOWING US TO SUPPORT WORTHWHILE COMMUNITY PROJECTS ACROSS THE SUBMARINE COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 St. Andrews Way
Church Aston
NEWPORT
TF10 9JH
- Phone:
- 07887502198
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window