Financial history CHILD'S VISION

Charity number: 1175345
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/08/2020 30/08/2021 30/08/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £38.75k £50.74k £68.88k £59.98k £78.82k
Total expenditure £26.39k £61.47k £44.35k £65.96k £58.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £740 £9.26k N/A £150 £300