Accounts and annual returns ST MARGARET'S SCHOOL OLTON PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 510700
Charity reporting is up to date (229 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 14 February 2025 229 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 13 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 20 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 September 2020 91 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required