Trustees THE TRIANGLE COMMUNITY METHODIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1174435
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
33 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev HILARY HOWARTH | Chair | 20 October 2014 |
|
|||||
Ruth Hall | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Gillian Elizabeth Kenyon | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Dolman | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Kenyon | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas John Frederick Arthur Cambray | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Don Astley | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Brian Jackson | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan Jermyn | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Clark | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Betty Anne Kirkham | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Faustin Musombwa | Trustee | 20 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
FIONA Elizabeth GORTON | Trustee | 31 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER LAYCOCK BA | Trustee | 31 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr SUSAN MARTIN MB CHB | Trustee | 31 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
JO FARRIS | Trustee | 31 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANN MASSEY | Trustee | 31 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
ESTELLE BUCKLEY | Trustee | 31 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BRIAN SMITH | Trustee | 31 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALISON CRITCHLEY | Trustee | 31 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
DENIS KIRKHAM | Trustee | 31 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
LESLIE HOWARTH | Trustee | 31 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Anne Haslam | Trustee | 20 October 2014 |
|
|||||
SHEILA NELSON | Trustee | 20 October 2014 |
|
|||||
COLIN NELSON | Trustee | 20 October 2014 |
|
|||||
DAVID STUART WHITTLE BA Hons | Trustee | 20 October 2014 |
|
|||||
DOREEN HOBSON | Trustee | 20 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER HASLAM | Trustee | 10 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
STEVE MASLIVEC BSC | Trustee | 10 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE READ | Trustee | 10 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
GLENNYS ASTLEY JP, BA | Trustee | 10 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
MANDY ATKINSON | Trustee | 10 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR MASSEY | Trustee | 10 October 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.