THE COUNCIL OF THE MAR THOMA PARISHES IN EUROPE (COMPE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity 's object is for public benefit, to advance the Christian religion within Europe, in particular but not exclusive by supporting all Mar Thoma parishes and congregations in Europe.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Canada
- India
- Ireland
- Mexico
- Northern Ireland
- United States
Governance
- 01 November 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BIJO KURUVILLA KURIAN | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev John Mathew Charivil | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Preetha Thomas | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev John T Thomas | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Thomas George | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacob P Abraham | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Joseph Abraham | Trustee | 31 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £159.08k | £129.90k | £232.63k | £395.84k | £211.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.14k | £23.04k | £77.05k | £72.15k | £103.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 01 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION WITHIN EUROPE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY SUPPORTING ALL MAR THOMA PARISHES AND CONGREGATIONS IN EUROPE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Priory Gardens
Ashford
Surrey
TW15 1NZ
- Phone:
- 02089588838
- Email:
- compeeurope@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window