PRESCRIPTION ART TEST VALLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PATV enables people with mental, emotional health and wellbeing needs to gain confidence through wide ranging art activities. Workshops and public exhibitions of their work encourages community activity and engagement. PATV is focused upon people living in test valley and surrounding areas. Participants are referred through health care professionals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 11 April 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JILL PENELOPE WILSON | Chair | 11 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Judith Giles | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr PETER JAMES WHITE | Trustee | 11 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.46k | £1.09k | £3.59k | £2.41k | £3.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.36k | £920 | £3.13k | £3.11k | £4.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.50k | £750 | £2.00k | £1.75k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 April 2021 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 April 2021 | 80 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Apr 2018 as amended on 22 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, IN PARTICULAR PEOPLE WITH MENTAL AND EMOTIONAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING NEEDS, THROUGH THE USE OF THE ARTS (ARTS THAT PROMOTE AND PROVIDE CREATIVE ACTIVITIES FOR THEIR BENEFIT, THROUGH PUBLIC EXHIBITIONS OF THEIR WORK AND THAT PROMOTE GREATER COMMUNITY ENGAGEMENT FOR INDIVIDUALS WITH EXPERIENCES OF MENTAL AND EMOTIONAL HEALTH/WELLBEING ISSUES AND SOCIAL ISOLATION LIVING IN TEST VALLEY AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
CORNER BARNS
MICHELMERSH
ROMSEY
SO51 0NR
- Phone:
- 01794368234
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window