YOUTH WITH A MISSION DERBY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To know God and make Him known, in Derby, the UK and overseas, through evangelism, training and mercy ministries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 October 2017: CIO registration
- YWAM DERBY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN POUNCE | Chair | 31 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Singlehurst | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Yan Nicholls | Trustee | 08 January 2018 |
|
|||||
Sandra J Hobbs | Trustee | 08 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
MR. ROBERT H0BBS | Trustee | 31 October 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.36k | £32.75k | £31.51k | £86.00k | £73.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.08k | £30.14k | £44.82k | £69.45k | £76.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 November 2020 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 November 2020 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 31 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
(1) THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO (ÔTHE OBJECTSÖ) WHICH ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ARE: THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ENGLAND AND ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ABROAD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. TO ADVANCE TRAINING IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES IN THE SAID COUNTRY AND ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ABROAD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN THE SAID COUNTRY AND ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ABROAD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. (2) THE OBJECTS ARE TO BE CARRIED OUT AS A PROCLAMATION OF THE BELIEFS SET OUT IN CLAUSE 31 (ÔSTATEMENT OF FAITHÖ) HEREIN. (3) NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008]
Contact information
- Address:
-
OVERDALE HOUSE
96 WHITAKER ROAD
DERBY
DE23 6AP
- Phone:
- 07766017598
- Email:
- info@ywamderby.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window