Financial history HANKOOL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1175365
Charity reporting is up to date (44 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £8.30k £13.71k £12.65k £9.40k £8.30k
Total expenditure £4.45k £4.75k £7.20k £7.20k £6.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A