OXFORD INSIGHT MEDITATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Oxford Insight Meditation supports and encourages the study and practice of Buddhist Insight meditation by organising a varied programme of classes, retreats and meetings. People of all backgrounds and traditions are welcome to participate. Our teachers are widely recognised; they are experienced, trained and bound by a code of ethics.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 21 November 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Kirsten Daniella Nicholson | Trustee | 17 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Tulip | Trustee | 02 September 2017 |
|
|||||
PAMELA SUTHERLAND | Trustee | 02 September 2017 |
|
|||||
BRIGID AVISON | Trustee | 02 September 2017 |
|
|||||
ANDREW FINNEY | Trustee | 02 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
ISABEL TUCKER | Trustee | 02 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.85k | £1.83k | £1.63k | £3.78k | £4.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.75k | £2.55k | £1.01k | £3.78k | £3.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 June 2024 | 237 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 June 2024 | 237 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF MEDITATION AND THE TEACHINGS OF THE BUDDHA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY SUPPORTING AND ENCOURAGING THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF BUDDHIST INSIGHT MEDITATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE IN OXFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
55 Bartlemas Road
Oxford
OX4 1XU
- Phone:
- 07795171652
- Website:
-
oxfordinsightmeditation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window