ALL SAINTS CHURCH LAXFIELD BELL RESTORATION APPEAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Primary activities are fundraising for restoration and continued maintenance, recruitment and development of bell ringers, ringing the village bells for services and community events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Suffolk
Governance
- 14 August 2017: Standard registration
- LAXFIELD PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL (PCC) BELLS (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FIONA JANE Shuttle | Chair | 01 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Marc Godfrey | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Mary Turton | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr PAUL MICHAEL WOODLIFFE MURPHY | Trustee | 05 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH CLARE HAMMOND | Trustee | 05 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM ALFRED HUNT | Trustee | 05 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2020 | 06/04/2021 | 06/04/2022 | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.17k | £33.92k | £39.05k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £73.30k | £64.19k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 22 July 2024 | 167 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2021 | 21 February 2022 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2021 | 26 January 2023 | 354 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2020 | 23 March 2021 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 05 AUG 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE PRESERVATION, RESTORATION, IMPROVEMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF THE RINGING OF BELLS AT THE GRADE 1 LISTED CHURCH OF ALL SAINTS, LAXFIELD IN THE COUNTY OF SUFFOLK. TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN THE FACILITIES FOR THE TEACHING, PRACTICE AND WIDER PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE OF THE TRADITIONAL ART OF CHURCH BELL RINGING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FLAX HOUSE
VICARAGE ROAD
LAXFIELD
WOODBRIDGE
IP13 8DT
- Phone:
- 01986798135
- Email:
- laxfieldbells@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window