Accounts and annual returns ALL SAINTS HOMELESS SHELTER

Charity number: 1176417
Charity reporting is up to date (198 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 09 August 2023 24 December 2024 198 days late
Accounts and TAR 09 August 2023 24 December 2024 198 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 09 August 2022 04 December 2023 178 days late
Accounts and TAR 09 August 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 December 2023 178 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 09 August 2021 22 December 2022 196 days late
Accounts and TAR 09 August 2021 22 December 2022 196 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 09 August 2020 09 November 2021 153 days late
Accounts and TAR 09 August 2020 09 November 2021 153 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 09 August 2019 03 December 2020 177 days late
Accounts and TAR 09 August 2019 03 December 2020 177 days late Download Open in new window