Financial history BROOKVALE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1174719
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £31.17k £28.83k £27.59k £32.15k £38.27k
Total expenditure £22.12k £19.71k £26.93k £33.44k £39.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.91k £8.50k £1.99k £4.42k