Financial history FAIR (FUNDING AUTO IMMUNE RESEARCH)

Charity number: 1176388
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £16.45k £6.69k £13.16k £61.35k £16.34k
Total expenditure £2.74k £15.61k £1.43k £16.42k £3.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A