BRICKET WOOD STATION HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve, renovate, reconstruct and operate for the benefit of the people of Bricket Wood, the county of Hertfordshire and of the nation at large, the historical, architectural and constructional heritage of the station building at Bricket Wood. This c.1903 station is one of the few surviving stations from the Edwardian period and the sole surviving "steam-age" structure on the Abbey Line.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 05 December 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Peever | Trustee | 24 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Emlyn Pryce | Trustee | 23 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM ROBERT YORKE | Trustee | 27 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
RAYMOND KENNETH MCLEAN | Trustee | 27 December 2017 |
|
|||||
PAUL AMSTERDAM | Trustee | 27 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Vito SEPE | Trustee | 27 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL STEPHEN WATSON | Trustee | 27 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.31k | £839 | £250.47k | £1.82k | £89.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.54k | £3.21k | £6.39k | £118.02k | £165.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 05 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
1. TO PRESERVE, RENOVATE, RECONSTRUCT AND OPERATE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF BRICKET WOOD, THE COUNTY OF HERTFORDSHIRE AND OF THE NATION AT LARGE, THE HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE OF THE STATION BUILDING AT BRICKET WOOD. THIS C.1903 STATION IS ONE OF THE FEW SURVIVING STATIONS FROM THE EDWARDIAN PERIOD AND THE SOLE SURVIVING "STEAM-AGE" STRUCTURE ON THE ABBEY LINE (WATFORD Û ST ALBANS ABBEY). 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE BRICKET WOOD STATION AND THE ABBEY LINE, ONE OF THE FEW SURVIVING BRANCH LINES FROM THE LONDON AND NORTH WESTERN RAILWAY (1846-1922), INCLUDING THE STUDY AND PRESERVATION OF INFORMATION, DRAWINGS, PHOTOGRAPHS, MODELS AND OTHER MATERIAL PERTAINING TO THE RAILWAY LINE, BRICKET WOOD, AND RELATED ORGANISATIONS AND SUBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Stephens Parish Centre
Station Road
Bricket Wood
ST. ALBANS
Hertfordshire
AL2 3PJ
- Phone:
- 07929754132
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window