Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LAURENCE, CHORLEY

Charity number: 1175130
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £139.71k £133.82k £188.99k £204.13k £415.75k
Total expenditure £133.14k £156.62k £195.57k £231.45k £490.01k
Income from government contracts £6.98k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.98k £11.58k N/A N/A £18.75k