THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LAURENCE, CHORLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Parochial Church Council (PCC) is a body corporate established by the Church of England. The Ecclesiastical Parish of Chorley St Laurence operates under the Parochial Church Council(Powers) Measure 1956.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £18,750 from 7 government grant(s)
People

17 Trustee(s)
175 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 12 October 2017: Standard registration
- ST. LAURENCE CHORLEY PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Canon Neil George Kelley | Chair | 27 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Brian Nigel Hall | Trustee | 25 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew William Walkden | Trustee | 24 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Cornelius Asghar | Trustee | 29 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Anne Hubberstey | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Carolin Pilkington | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fraser Llewellyn Marlton-Thomas | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Barraclough | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Christopher Simon Pryor | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bernard Oakley | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Kirsty Helen Marlton-Thomas | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Pattison | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neal Bennet-Williams | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Forbes Cruickshank Barrack | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALAN WINSTANLEY | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Hall | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Antony Checker | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £139.71k | £133.82k | £188.99k | £204.13k | £415.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £133.14k | £156.62k | £195.57k | £231.45k | £490.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £6.98k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.98k | £11.58k | N/A | N/A | £18.75k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH, PASTORAL, EVANGELISTIC, SOCIAL AND ECUMENICAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Lawrences Church
Union Street
CHORLEY
PR7 1EB
- Phone:
- 01257 231360
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window