BOZEAT COMMUNITY HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bozeat Community Hall was initially formed to lease St Mary's Church Hall, Bozeat from the Peterborough Diocesan Board of Finance and continue to operate the hall as a Community Hall. Unfortunately agreement concerning the terms of the lease could not be agreed and consequently Bozeat Community Hall trustees are now seeking to locate avaiable land on which to build a new hall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 06 September 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN GIBBINS | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|||||
TERRY LYALL | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Daniel James Nicholas Cooke | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £40 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 07 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 07 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 22 March 2024 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 22 March 2024 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 13 March 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 13 March 2023 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Sep 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ESTABLISH AND RUN A VILLAGE HALL AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF BOZEAT ("AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
85 London Road
Bozeat
WELLINGBOROUGH
Northamptonshire
NN29 7JR
- Phone:
- 07836522747
- Email:
- b.gibbins726@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window