POPPLETON METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Poppleton Methodist Church has Sunday service at 10:30. During the week we have a range of community activities in our hall including "Coffee on the Green" at : 10:00-16:00 every Monday and Tuesday (10:00-14:00 when Tuesday Fellowship meet). In addition there is a range of clubs and societies that operate from our premises. See our website at http://www.poppletonmethodistchurch.org.uk/
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

23 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 11 July 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
23 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Elizabeth Cushion | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marian Frances Beck | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Bailey | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Andrew Priestnall | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Dickson Middleton | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Scholtz | Trustee | 27 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christine Scholtz | Trustee | 27 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH WRIGHT | Trustee | 27 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE STEPHENSON | Trustee | 27 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARILYN INGLE | Trustee | 27 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Brian Latto | Trustee | 27 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN LYNN | Trustee | 27 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Middleton | Trustee | 27 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MOIRA DACKER | Trustee | 27 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANN MOIRA HOWARD | Trustee | 27 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN CUSHING | Trustee | 27 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER COOKSON | Trustee | 27 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALAN WRIGHT | Trustee | 27 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA LATTO | Trustee | 27 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE MARGARET BOOTHMAN | Trustee | 27 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
WENDY HEAP | Trustee | 27 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
LYNDA JOHNSON | Trustee | 27 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Steven Boothman | Trustee | 26 January 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.24k | £83.83k | £226.54k | £197.41k | £138.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.14k | £96.29k | £269.68k | £455.03k | £111.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 26 November 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 26 OCT 1976
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
98 MAIN STREET
UPPER POPPLETON
YORK
YO26 6JU
- Phone:
- 01904786615
- Email:
- elizabethcushion@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window