Accounts and annual returns VALUED LIVES

Charity number: 1175695
Charity reporting is overdue by 1160 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 64 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 64 days
Annual return 30 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 429 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 429 days
Annual return 30 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 795 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 795 days
Annual return 30 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1160 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1160 days
Annual return 30 April 2020 08 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 08 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window