Accounts and annual returns HARVEST ASSEMBLY

Charity number: 1177394
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 23 November 2023 23 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 23 November 2023 23 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 23 November 2022 01 October 2023 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 23 November 2022 01 October 2023 8 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 23 November 2021 23 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 23 November 2021 23 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 23 November 2020 22 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 23 November 2020 22 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 23 November 2019 23 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 23 November 2019 23 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window