Accounts and annual returns PORLOCK RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 1176921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 06 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 06 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 21 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window