Financial history PORLOCK RECREATION GROUND

Charity Number: 1176921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £14.36k £43.78k £31.14k £34.69k £36.57k
Total expenditure £30.69k £37.27k £30.49k £32.21k £30.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.89k N/A N/A N/A