PORLOCK RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management and promotion of recreation facilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 31 January 2018: CIO registration
- 04 July 2019: Funds received from 304615 RECREATION GROUND
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzanne Adlington | Trustee | 18 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Denys Lyons | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Jonathon Crompton Maw | Trustee | 25 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Anthony Kenward | Trustee | 25 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jayson Horne | Trustee | 25 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Duncan McCanlis | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Ann Thornton | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sue McCanlis | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Fraser | Trustee | 04 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
NORA MAW | Trustee | 04 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
MRS TERRY GABLE | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.36k | £43.78k | £31.14k | £34.69k | £36.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.69k | £37.27k | £30.49k | £32.21k | £30.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.89k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 31 Jan 2018 as amended on 18 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
(1) THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO RETAIN, MANAGE AND PROMOTE AREAS INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THOSE IDENTIFIED AS THE LAND EDGED IN RED ON THE ATTACHED PLANS (LAND REGISTRY TITLES ST300967 AND ST301095 AS AT 21 DECEMBER 2016) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS AND VISITORS TO THE PARISH OF PORLOCK TO BE USED FOR THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF ALL INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE AIM OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS AND VISITORS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Pavilion
Porlock Recreation Ground
Parsons Street
Porlock
MINEHEAD
TA24 8QJ
- Phone:
- 00
- Email:
- porlockrecground@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window